E
|
05/23/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
05/23/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4468
|
E
|
05/14/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3676
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1593
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3545
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3548
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3402
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1563
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1563
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1563
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1563
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1563
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1563
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1562
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1504
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 1298
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1298
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1100
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1945
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1848
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#341
|
Journal Page: 1850
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1850
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1850
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1839
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1839
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1581
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2015
|
Referred to County Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 700
|
House
|
03/13/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 700
|
House
|
03/05/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|