Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2410 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/11/2015

                    By: Nevárez (Senate Sponsor - Uresti) H.B. No. 2410
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2015;
 May 4, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 11, 2015, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 11, 2015, sent to
 printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the annual audit of the books and records of the
 Maverick County Hospital District.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1118.154(b), Special District Local Laws
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (b)  On or before March 1 [Not later than January 1] of each
 year, the board shall:
 (1)  file a copy of the audit with the district; and
 (2)  provide a copy of the audit at each public library
 located in the district.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *