H.B. No. 2424 AN ACT relating to fees paid to the Automobile Burglary and Theft Prevention Authority. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 6A, Article 4413(37), Revised Statutes, is amended by adding Subsections (e) and (f) to read as follows: (e) Except as provided by Subsection (f), a request for a refund made under this section must be made not later than four years after the date the payment was made to the authority under Section 10 of this article. (f) This subsection expires September 1, 2017. Notwithstanding Subsection (e) of this section, an insurer must refile a request for a refund under this section with the authority not later than November 1, 2015, if the request was: (1) initially made after January 1, 2010; (2) initially made before September 1, 2015; and (3) denied before September 1, 2015, solely on the basis of the six-month deadline established by Section 11, Chapter 305 (H.B. 1387), Acts of the 75th Legislature, Regular Session, 1997. SECTION 2. Section 11, Chapter 305 (H.B. 1387), Acts of the 75th Legislature, Regular Session, 1997, is repealed. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2015. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I certify that H.B. No. 2424 was passed by the House on May 5, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 145, Nays 0, 2 present, not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House I certify that H.B. No. 2424 was passed by the Senate on May 22, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate APPROVED: _____________________ Date _____________________ Governor