Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2424 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Thompson of Harris (Senate Sponsor - Eltife) H.B. No. 2424
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2015;
 May 7, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Business
 and Commerce; May 15, 2015, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 15, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 EltifeX
 CreightonX
 EllisX
 HuffinesX
 SchwertnerX
 SeligerX
 TaylorofGalvestonX
 WatsonX
 WhitmireX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to fees paid to the Automobile Burglary and Theft
 Prevention Authority.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 6A, Article 4413(37), Revised Statutes,
 is amended by adding Subsections (e) and (f) to read as follows:
 (e)  Except as provided by Subsection (f), a request for a
 refund made under this section must be made not later than four
 years after the date the payment was made to the authority under
 Section 10 of this article.
 (f)  This subsection expires September 1, 2017.
 Notwithstanding Subsection (e) of this section, an insurer must
 refile a request for a refund under this section with the authority
 not later than November 1, 2015, if the request was:
 (1)  initially made after January 1, 2010;
 (2)  initially made before September 1, 2015; and
 (3)  denied before September 1, 2015, solely on the
 basis of the six-month deadline established by Section 11, Chapter
 305 (H.B. 1387), Acts of the 75th Legislature, Regular Session,
 1997.
 SECTION 2.  Section 11, Chapter 305 (H.B. 1387), Acts of the
 75th Legislature, Regular Session, 1997, is repealed.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *