Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2446 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/05/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            84R5411 AAF-D
 By: White of Tyler H.B. No. 2446


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a study and report on online law schools and on the
 licensing of attorneys who obtain degrees through online or
 correspondence law schools or who become licensed through other
 nontraditional methods.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 61, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 61.0908 to read as follows:
 Sec. 61.0908.  STUDY AND REPORT ON ONLINE LAW SCHOOLS AND
 LICENSING OF ATTORNEYS. (a) The board, in collaboration with the
 Board of Law Examiners, shall conduct a study regarding the future
 of online law schools and the licensing of attorneys in this state
 who obtain law degrees through online or correspondence law schools
 or who become licensed in other states through apprenticeship
 programs.
 (b)  The study must include an evaluation of:
 (1)  online or correspondence law schools in other
 states;
 (2)  legal apprenticeship programs in other states;
 (3)  alternative methods of accreditation of law
 schools in other states; and
 (4)  alternative methods of licensing an attorney who:
 (A)  obtained a law degree through a law school
 unapproved by this state; or
 (B)  was licensed in another state through a legal
 apprenticeship program.
 (c)  The board shall include the results of the study and any
 recommendations for legislative or administrative action in a
 report submitted to the governor and the legislature before
 December 31, 2016.
 (d)  This section expires September 1, 2017.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than January 1, 2016, the Texas Higher
 Education Coordinating Board shall adopt rules necessary to
 implement Section 61.0908, Education Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.