Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2463 Enrolled / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 84TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            May 22, 2015      TO: Honorable Joe Straus, Speaker of the House, House of Representatives      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB2463 by Raymond (Relating to the continuation of the functions of the Department of Assistive and Rehabilitative Services and certain other functions. ), As Passed 2nd House   Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB2463, As Passed 2nd House: a positive impact of $70,177 through the biennium ending August 31, 2017. 

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 84TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
May 22, 2015





  TO: Honorable Joe Straus, Speaker of the House, House of Representatives      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB2463 by Raymond (Relating to the continuation of the functions of the Department of Assistive and Rehabilitative Services and certain other functions. ), As Passed 2nd House  

TO: Honorable Joe Straus, Speaker of the House, House of Representatives
FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB2463 by Raymond (Relating to the continuation of the functions of the Department of Assistive and Rehabilitative Services and certain other functions. ), As Passed 2nd House

 Honorable Joe Straus, Speaker of the House, House of Representatives 

 Honorable Joe Straus, Speaker of the House, House of Representatives 

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB2463 by Raymond (Relating to the continuation of the functions of the Department of Assistive and Rehabilitative Services and certain other functions. ), As Passed 2nd House

HB2463 by Raymond (Relating to the continuation of the functions of the Department of Assistive and Rehabilitative Services and certain other functions. ), As Passed 2nd House

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB2463, As Passed 2nd House: a positive impact of $70,177 through the biennium ending August 31, 2017. 

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB2463, As Passed 2nd House: a positive impact of $70,177 through the biennium ending August 31, 2017.

General Revenue-Related Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Net Positive/(Negative) Impact to General Revenue Related Funds  2016 $0   2017 $70,177   2018 $70,177   2019 $70,177   2020 $70,177    


2016 $0
2017 $70,177
2018 $70,177
2019 $70,177
2020 $70,177

 All Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Savings/(Cost) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1  Probable Savings/(Cost) fromFederal Funds555  Change in Number of State Employees from FY 2015   2016 $0 $0 0.0   2017 $70,177 $335,957 (24.0)   2018 $70,177 $335,957 (24.0)   2019 $70,177 $335,957 (24.0)   2020 $70,177 $335,957 (24.0)   

  Fiscal Year Probable Savings/(Cost) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1  Probable Savings/(Cost) fromFederal Funds555  Change in Number of State Employees from FY 2015   2016 $0 $0 0.0   2017 $70,177 $335,957 (24.0)   2018 $70,177 $335,957 (24.0)   2019 $70,177 $335,957 (24.0)   2020 $70,177 $335,957 (24.0)  


2016 $0 $0 0.0
2017 $70,177 $335,957 (24.0)
2018 $70,177 $335,957 (24.0)
2019 $70,177 $335,957 (24.0)
2020 $70,177 $335,957 (24.0)

Fiscal Analysis

The bill would partially implement the Sunset Advisory Commission recommendations concerning the Department of Assistive and Rehabilitative Services (DARS).  The bill would create the Transition Legislative Oversight Committee to facilitate and report on the transfer of functions contained both in the bill and in other health and human service enterprise bills.The bill would require the integration into one program of the independent living services program for the blind and independent living services program for those with disabilities other than blindness.  By September 1, 2016, integrated program services would be provided solely at centers for independent living, except in areas where a center is not willing or able to provide services, in which case DARS may contract for the services.  The bill would grant DARS authorization to provide comprehensive rehabilitation services and autism services. The bill would define the administration of DARS direct services programs, including caseworker guidelines, the creation of a case review system, and program monitoring. The bill would require the executive commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission (HHSC) to adopt rules to implement the bill as soon as practicable upon effective date. The bill directs that any federal waiver or authorization necessary to implement the provisions of the bill be requested, and authorizes affected agencies to delay implementation of provisions until such waiver or authorization is granted.The bill would abolish and transfer the functions of DARS that are not transferred in other legislation to HHSC by September 1, 2016, in the event that other legislation consolidating DARS functions does not pass.  The bill is effective September 1, 2015.

Methodology

This analysis assumes that appropriations of $11.6 million per fiscal year for direct staff services currently provided to DARS for the independent living services programs would continue in the form of grants to centers for independent living.  This would result in a reduction at DARS of 24 caseworkers beginning in fiscal year 2017.  Savings from associated benefits appropriated elsewhere in the budget are based on a DARS average salary and other personnel costs per caseworker of $49,950 per fiscal year.  Savings also accrue from a reduction of the agency 1.5 percent payroll contribution to the Employees Retirement System.The establishment of the comprehensive rehabilitation program and autism programs in statute codifies existing agency activities and would not cost the state.  The additional administrative responsibilities would result in no significant fiscal impact.Based on the analysis provided by HHSC, the cost of consolidation of DARS functions into HHSC cannot be determined. HHSC anticipates costs and throughout the implementation and operational years. 

Local Government Impact

No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 116 Sunset Advisory Commission, 529 Health and Human Services Commission, 538 Assistive and Rehabilitative Services, Department of

116 Sunset Advisory Commission, 529 Health and Human Services Commission, 538 Assistive and Rehabilitative Services, Department of

LBB Staff: UP, NB, MB, VJC, WP

 UP, NB, MB, VJC, WP