LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
House
Bills
HB2463
Compare Versions
TX
Texas House Bill HB2463
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas House Bill HB2463
Compare Versions
HB2463 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB2463 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB2463 Enrolled May 26, 2015
HB2463 Comm Sub May 18, 2015
HB2463 Engrossed April 10, 2015
HB2463 Comm Sub March 29, 2015
HB2463 Introduced March 5, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
HB2463 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB2463 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB2463 Enrolled May 26, 2015
HB2463 Comm Sub May 18, 2015
HB2463 Engrossed April 10, 2015
HB2463 Comm Sub March 29, 2015
HB2463 Introduced March 5, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare