Senate | 05/14/2015 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 1609 | |
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1609 | |
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1590 | |
House | 05/13/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3548 | |
House | 05/13/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3284 | |
House | 05/13/2015 | Record vote | RV#997 | Journal Page: 3284 |
House | 05/13/2015 | Passed as amended | Journal Page: 3284 | |
House | 05/13/2015 | Amended | 1-Y. Davis and Isaac | Journal Page: 3283 |
House | 05/13/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3283 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3132 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Record vote | RV#917 | Journal Page: 3132 |
House | 05/12/2015 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3132 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Vote reconsidered | Journal Page: 3130 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | 1 hr. notice-for reconsideration | Journal Page: 3066 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3042 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Record vote | RV#886 | Journal Page: 3041 |
House | 05/11/2015 | Failed to pass to engrossment | Journal Page: 3041 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Point of order overruled | Rule 1, Section 4 | Journal Page: 3040 |
House | 05/11/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3040 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/04/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/04/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/01/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2451 | |
House | 04/22/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/13/2015 | Referred to Investments & Financial Services | Journal Page: 703 | |
House | 03/13/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 703 | |
House | 03/05/2015 | Filed |