Senate | 05/11/2015 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 1501 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1501 | |
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1310 | |
House | 05/04/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2560 | |
House | 05/04/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2401 | |
House | 05/04/2015 | Record vote | RV#569 | Journal Page: 2400 |
House | 05/04/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 2400 | |
House | 05/04/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2391 | |
House | 05/02/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/01/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2338 | |
House | 05/01/2015 | Record vote | RV#519 | Journal Page: 2337 |
House | 05/01/2015 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2337 | |
House | 05/01/2015 | Amended | 1-Simpson | Journal Page: 2337 |
House | 05/01/2015 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2337 | |
House | 05/01/2015 | Postponed | Journal Page: 2314 | |
House | 05/01/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2314 | |
House | 05/01/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Record vote | RV#490 | Journal Page: 2245 |
House | 04/30/2015 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 2245 | |
House | 04/27/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/02/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/02/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/01/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1374 | |
House | 03/31/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/31/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/13/2015 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 704 | |
House | 03/13/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 704 | |
House | 03/05/2015 | Filed |