House | 05/11/2015 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/11/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3112 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | Recommendations filed with the Speaker | Journal Page: 1472 | |
House | 03/13/2015 | Referred to Special Purpose Districts | Journal Page: 704 | |
House | 03/13/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 704 | |
House | 03/12/2015 | Transmitted to the Governor | ||
House | 03/05/2015 | Filed |