E
|
05/29/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
05/29/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5697
|
E
|
05/20/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4088
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1715
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3785
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3846
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3573
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1621
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1621
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1621
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1621
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1621
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1621
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1621
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1437
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 1158
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1158
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1100
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1945
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1869
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#360
|
Journal Page: 1868
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1868
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1868
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1817
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1817
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1551
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2015
|
Referred to Insurance
|
|
Journal Page: 724
|
House
|
03/16/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 724
|
House
|
03/06/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|