E | 06/17/2015 | Effective on 9/1/15 | ||
E | 06/17/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6049 | |
E | 05/28/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 5571 | |
Senate | 05/28/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2862 | |
House | 05/27/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4970 | |
House | 05/27/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 5212 | |
House | 05/26/2015 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4759 | |
Senate | 05/25/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2060 | |
Senate | 05/25/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 2060 | |
Senate | 05/25/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2060 | |
Senate | 05/25/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2059 | |
Senate | 05/25/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2059 | |
Senate | 05/25/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2059 | |
Senate | 05/25/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2059 | |
Senate | 05/25/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1945 | |
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 1610 | |
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1610 | |
Senate | 05/13/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1553 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3405 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Record vote | RV#947 | Journal Page: 3165 |
House | 05/12/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 3165 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3165 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3075 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3075 | |
House | 05/09/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | Record vote | RV#686 | Journal Page: 2680 |
House | 05/07/2015 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 2680 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2268 | |
House | 04/27/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/16/2015 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 725 | |
House | 03/16/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 725 | |
House | 03/06/2015 | Filed |