Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB250 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 84R954 TJB-D
22 By: Leach H.B. No. 250
33
44
55 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
66 AN ACT
77 relating to the phaseout and repeal of the franchise tax; lowering
88 the rates of the tax.
99 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1010 SECTION 1. (a) Effective January 1, 2016, Sections
1111 171.002(a) and (b), Tax Code, are amended to read as follows:
1212 (a) Subject to Sections 171.003 and 171.1016 and except as
1313 provided by Subsection (b), the rate of the franchise tax is 0.8
1414 [one] percent of taxable margin.
1515 (b) Subject to Sections 171.003 and 171.1016, the rate of
1616 the franchise tax is 0.4 [0.5] percent of taxable margin for those
1717 taxable entities primarily engaged in retail or wholesale trade.
1818 (b) This section applies only to a report originally due on
1919 or after January 1, 2016.
2020 SECTION 2. (a) Effective January 1, 2017, Sections
2121 171.002(a) and (b), Tax Code, are amended to read as follows:
2222 (a) Subject to Sections 171.003 and 171.1016 and except as
2323 provided by Subsection (b), the rate of the franchise tax is 0.56
2424 [one] percent of taxable margin.
2525 (b) Subject to Sections 171.003 and 171.1016, the rate of
2626 the franchise tax is 0.28 [0.5] percent of taxable margin for those
2727 taxable entities primarily engaged in retail or wholesale trade.
2828 (b) This section applies only to a report originally due on
2929 or after January 1, 2017.
3030 SECTION 3. (a) Effective January 1, 2018, Sections
3131 171.002(a) and (b), Tax Code, are amended to read as follows:
3232 (a) Subject to Sections 171.003 and 171.1016 and except as
3333 provided by Subsection (b), the rate of the franchise tax is 0.336
3434 [one] percent of taxable margin.
3535 (b) Subject to Sections 171.003 and 171.1016, the rate of
3636 the franchise tax is 0.168 [0.5] percent of taxable margin for those
3737 taxable entities primarily engaged in retail or wholesale trade.
3838 (b) This section applies only to a report originally due on
3939 or after January 1, 2018.
4040 SECTION 4. (a) Effective January 1, 2019, Sections
4141 171.002(a) and (b), Tax Code, are amended to read as follows:
4242 (a) Subject to Sections 171.003 and 171.1016 and except as
4343 provided by Subsection (b), the rate of the franchise tax is 0.168
4444 [one] percent of taxable margin.
4545 (b) Subject to Sections 171.003 and 171.1016, the rate of
4646 the franchise tax is 0.084 [0.5] percent of taxable margin for those
4747 taxable entities primarily engaged in retail or wholesale trade.
4848 (b) This section applies only to a report originally due on
4949 or after January 1, 2019.
5050 SECTION 5. (a) Effective January 1, 2016, Section
5151 171.1016(b), Tax Code, is amended to read as follows:
5252 (b) The amount of the tax for which a taxable entity that
5353 elects to pay the tax as provided by this section is liable is
5454 computed by:
5555 (1) determining the taxable entity's total revenue
5656 from its entire business, as determined under Section 171.1011;
5757 (2) apportioning the amount computed under
5858 Subdivision (1) to this state, as provided by Section 171.106, to
5959 determine the taxable entity's apportioned total revenue; and
6060 (3) multiplying the amount computed under Subdivision
6161 (2) by the rate of 0.46 [0.575] percent.
6262 (b) This section applies only to a report originally due on
6363 or after January 1, 2016.
6464 SECTION 6. (a) Effective January 1, 2017, Section
6565 171.1016(b), Tax Code, is amended to read as follows:
6666 (b) The amount of the tax for which a taxable entity that
6767 elects to pay the tax as provided by this section is liable is
6868 computed by:
6969 (1) determining the taxable entity's total revenue
7070 from its entire business, as determined under Section 171.1011;
7171 (2) apportioning the amount computed under
7272 Subdivision (1) to this state, as provided by Section 171.106, to
7373 determine the taxable entity's apportioned total revenue; and
7474 (3) multiplying the amount computed under Subdivision
7575 (2) by the rate of 0.322 [0.575] percent.
7676 (b) This section applies only to a report originally due on
7777 or after January 1, 2017.
7878 SECTION 7. (a) Effective January 1, 2018, Section
7979 171.1016(b), Tax Code, is amended to read as follows:
8080 (b) The amount of the tax for which a taxable entity that
8181 elects to pay the tax as provided by this section is liable is
8282 computed by:
8383 (1) determining the taxable entity's total revenue
8484 from its entire business, as determined under Section 171.1011;
8585 (2) apportioning the amount computed under
8686 Subdivision (1) to this state, as provided by Section 171.106, to
8787 determine the taxable entity's apportioned total revenue; and
8888 (3) multiplying the amount computed under Subdivision
8989 (2) by the rate of 0.193 [0.575] percent.
9090 (b) This section applies only to a report originally due on
9191 or after January 1, 2018.
9292 SECTION 8. (a) Effective January 1, 2019, Section
9393 171.1016(b), Tax Code, is amended to read as follows:
9494 (b) The amount of the tax for which a taxable entity that
9595 elects to pay the tax as provided by this section is liable is
9696 computed by:
9797 (1) determining the taxable entity's total revenue
9898 from its entire business, as determined under Section 171.1011;
9999 (2) apportioning the amount computed under
100100 Subdivision (1) to this state, as provided by Section 171.106, to
101101 determine the taxable entity's apportioned total revenue; and
102102 (3) multiplying the amount computed under Subdivision
103103 (2) by the rate of 0.097 [0.575] percent.
104104 (b) This section applies only to a report originally due on
105105 or after January 1, 2019.
106106 SECTION 9. (a) Chapter 171, Tax Code, is repealed.
107107 (b) A taxable entity that is subject to the franchise tax
108108 imposed under Chapter 171, Tax Code, on December 31, 2019, shall
109109 file a final franchise tax report and pay a transitional tax as
110110 required by this subsection on or before May 15, 2020. The
111111 transitional tax is equal to the tax the taxable entity would have
112112 paid in 2020 under Chapter 171, Tax Code, if Chapter 171, Tax Code,
113113 had not been repealed. The provisions of Chapter 171, Tax Code,
114114 relating to the computation and payment of the franchise tax remain
115115 in effect after the repeal of Chapter 171, Tax Code, by this section
116116 for the purposes of computing and paying the transitional tax
117117 required by this subsection.
118118 (c) Chapter 171, Tax Code, and Subtitle B, Title 2, Tax
119119 Code, continue to apply to audits, deficiencies, redeterminations,
120120 and refunds of any tax due or collected under Chapter 171, including
121121 the tax due as provided by Subsection (b) of this section, until
122122 barred by limitations.
123123 (d) The repeal of Chapter 171, Tax Code, does not affect:
124124 (1) the status of a taxable entity that has had its
125125 corporate privileges, certificate of authority, certificate of
126126 organization, certificate of limited partnership, corporate
127127 charter, or registration revoked, suit filed against it, or a
128128 receiver appointed under Subchapter F, G, or H of that chapter;
129129 (2) the ability of the comptroller of public accounts,
130130 secretary of state, or attorney general to take action against a
131131 taxable entity under Subchapter F, G, or H of that chapter for
132132 actions that took place before the repeal; or
133133 (3) the right of a taxable entity to contest a
134134 forfeiture, revocation, lawsuit, or appointment of a receiver under
135135 Subchapter F, G, or H of that chapter.
136136 (e) This section takes effect January 1, 2020.
137137 SECTION 10. Except as otherwise provided by this Act, this
138138 Act applies only to a report originally due on or after the
139139 effective date of this Act.
140140 SECTION 11. Except as otherwise provided by this Act, this
141141 Act takes effect January 1, 2016.