House | 04/23/2015 | Recommitted to committee | Journal Page: 1933 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Point of order withdrawn | Rule 4, Section 32(c) | Journal Page: 1933 |
House | 04/23/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1933 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Record vote | RV#372 | Journal Page: 1932 |
House | 04/23/2015 | Amended | 18-Schaefer | Journal Page: 1932 |
House | 04/23/2015 | Motion to table fails | 18-Schaefer | Journal Page: 1930 |
House | 04/23/2015 | Point of order overruled (amendment) | Rule 11, Section 2 and Rule 11, Section 3 | Journal Page: 1927 |
House | 04/23/2015 | Amendment(s) offered | 18-Schaefer | Journal Page: 1926 |
House | 04/23/2015 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1926 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 1918 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Postponed | 4/23/15 3:30 PM | Journal Page: 1905 |
House | 04/23/2015 | Point of order withdrawn (amendment) | Rule 11, Section 6 | Journal Page: 1905 |
House | 04/23/2015 | Amendment adopted as amended | 15-Zerwas | Journal Page: 1904 |
House | 04/23/2015 | Amendment amended | 16-Zerwas | Journal Page: 1903 |
House | 04/23/2015 | Amendment as amended withdrawn | 13-Y. Davis | Journal Page: 1902 |
House | 04/23/2015 | Amendment withdrawn | 11-Bell | Journal Page: 1888 |
House | 04/21/2015 | Postponed | 4/23/15 9:00 AM | Journal Page: 1768 |
House | 04/21/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1768 | |
House | 04/21/2015 | Placed on Major State Calendar | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/10/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1530 | |
House | 04/06/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/17/2015 | Referred to Human Services | Journal Page: 776 | |
House | 03/17/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 776 | |
House | 03/06/2015 | Filed |