By: Thompson of Harris, Guillen H.B. No. 2511 (Senate Sponsor - Huffman) (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2015; May 13, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Business and Commerce; May 22, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 22, 2015, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote COMMITTEE VOTE YeaNayAbsentPNV EltifeX CreightonX EllisX HuffinesX SchwertnerX SeligerX TaylorofGalvestonX WatsonX WhitmireX A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the creation of the human trafficking prevention business partnership. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 405, Government Code, is amended by adding Section 405.023 to read as follows: Sec. 405.023. HUMAN TRAFFICKING PREVENTION BUSINESS PARTNERSHIP. (a) In this section, "partnership" means the human trafficking prevention business partnership. (b) The secretary of state by rule shall establish and implement a program designated as the human trafficking prevention business partnership to engage participating corporations and other private entities in voluntary efforts to prevent and combat human trafficking. (c) The secretary of state shall present a certificate of recognition to a participating corporation or private entity to recognize the corporation's or entity's contributions to the efforts of federal, state, and local officials engaged in combatting human trafficking and prosecuting human trafficking crimes. (d) A corporation or other private entity that participates in the partnership shall: (1) adopt a zero tolerance policy toward human trafficking; (2) take measures to ensure that the corporation's or entity's employees comply with the policy adopted under Subdivision (1); (3) participate in public awareness and education campaigns; (4) enhance awareness of and encourage participation in the partnership; and (5) share with the secretary of state best practices that are effective in combatting human trafficking. (e) The secretary of state shall work collaboratively with other state agencies to promote the partnership. (f) The secretary of state may use private and philanthropic resources to support the work of the partnership. SECTION 2. Not later than December 1, 2015, the secretary of state shall establish the program designated as the human trafficking prevention business partnership as required under Section 405.023, Government Code, as added by this Act. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2015. * * * * *