1 | | - | By: Thompson of Harris, Guillen H.B. No. 2511 |
---|
2 | | - | (Senate Sponsor - Huffman) |
---|
3 | | - | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2015; |
---|
4 | | - | May 13, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Business |
---|
5 | | - | and Commerce; May 22, 2015, reported favorably by the following |
---|
6 | | - | vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 22, 2015, sent to printer.) |
---|
7 | | - | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 1 | + | H.B. No. 2511 |
---|
22 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
23 | 5 | | relating to the creation of the human trafficking prevention |
---|
24 | 6 | | business partnership. |
---|
25 | 7 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
26 | 8 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 405, Government Code, is |
---|
27 | 9 | | amended by adding Section 405.023 to read as follows: |
---|
28 | 10 | | Sec. 405.023. HUMAN TRAFFICKING PREVENTION BUSINESS |
---|
29 | 11 | | PARTNERSHIP. (a) In this section, "partnership" means the human |
---|
30 | 12 | | trafficking prevention business partnership. |
---|
31 | 13 | | (b) The secretary of state by rule shall establish and |
---|
32 | 14 | | implement a program designated as the human trafficking prevention |
---|
33 | 15 | | business partnership to engage participating corporations and |
---|
34 | 16 | | other private entities in voluntary efforts to prevent and combat |
---|
35 | 17 | | human trafficking. |
---|
36 | 18 | | (c) The secretary of state shall present a certificate of |
---|
37 | 19 | | recognition to a participating corporation or private entity to |
---|
38 | 20 | | recognize the corporation's or entity's contributions to the |
---|
39 | 21 | | efforts of federal, state, and local officials engaged in |
---|
40 | 22 | | combatting human trafficking and prosecuting human trafficking |
---|
41 | 23 | | crimes. |
---|
42 | 24 | | (d) A corporation or other private entity that participates |
---|
43 | 25 | | in the partnership shall: |
---|
44 | 26 | | (1) adopt a zero tolerance policy toward human |
---|
45 | 27 | | trafficking; |
---|
46 | 28 | | (2) take measures to ensure that the corporation's or |
---|
47 | 29 | | entity's employees comply with the policy adopted under Subdivision |
---|
48 | 30 | | (1); |
---|
49 | 31 | | (3) participate in public awareness and education |
---|
50 | 32 | | campaigns; |
---|
51 | 33 | | (4) enhance awareness of and encourage participation |
---|
52 | 34 | | in the partnership; and |
---|
53 | 35 | | (5) share with the secretary of state best practices |
---|
54 | 36 | | that are effective in combatting human trafficking. |
---|
55 | 37 | | (e) The secretary of state shall work collaboratively with |
---|
56 | 38 | | other state agencies to promote the partnership. |
---|
57 | 39 | | (f) The secretary of state may use private and philanthropic |
---|
58 | 40 | | resources to support the work of the partnership. |
---|
59 | 41 | | SECTION 2. Not later than December 1, 2015, the secretary of |
---|
60 | 42 | | state shall establish the program designated as the human |
---|
61 | 43 | | trafficking prevention business partnership as required under |
---|
62 | 44 | | Section 405.023, Government Code, as added by this Act. |
---|
63 | 45 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
64 | 46 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
65 | 47 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
66 | 48 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
67 | 49 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2015. |
---|
68 | | - | * * * * * |
---|
| 50 | + | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
| 51 | + | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
| 52 | + | I certify that H.B. No. 2511 was passed by the House on May 5, |
---|
| 53 | + | 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 143, Nays 2, 2 present, not |
---|
| 54 | + | voting. |
---|
| 55 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 56 | + | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
| 57 | + | I certify that H.B. No. 2511 was passed by the Senate on May |
---|
| 58 | + | 27, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1. |
---|
| 59 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 60 | + | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
| 61 | + | APPROVED: _____________________ |
---|
| 62 | + | Date |
---|
| 63 | + | _____________________ |
---|
| 64 | + | Governor |
---|