House
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5570
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5570
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3343
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 3343
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3138
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3138
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3138
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5234
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5234
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 5234
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4573
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1975
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1975
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1975
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1974
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1974
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1974
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1974
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1850
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 1610
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1610
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1590
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3548
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3300
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1015
|
Journal Page: 3300
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3300
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3300
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3216
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3216
|
House
|
05/09/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#686
|
Journal Page: 2680
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2680
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2675
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2015
|
Referred to County Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 726
|
House
|
03/16/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 726
|
House
|
03/06/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|