Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2533 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Goldman, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Seliger) H.B. No. 2533
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2015;
 May 4, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Business
 and Commerce; May 20, 2015, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 20, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the repeal of an offense prohibiting offensive noise on
 a premises covered by an alcoholic beverage license or permit.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 101.62, Alcoholic Beverage Code, is
 repealed.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *