Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2557 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-By: Zerwas (Senate Sponsor - West) H.B. No. 2557
2- (In the Senate - Received from the House April 28, 2015;
3- May 5, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
4- Intergovernmental Relations; May 13, 2015, reported favorably by
5- the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 13, 2015, sent to printer.)
6-Click here to see the committee vote
1+H.B. No. 2557
72
83
9- A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
104 AN ACT
115 relating to certain hospital districts and to certain corporations
126 or organizations formed by those districts.
137 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
148 SECTION 1. Section 281.0518, Health and Safety Code, is
159 amended by adding Subsection (a-1) to read as follows:
1610 (a-1) For purposes of Subsection (a)(3):
1711 (1) a public or private entity may be a for-profit or a
1812 nonprofit entity; and
1913 (2) a nonprofit corporation formed by the district may
2014 hold an ownership interest in a public or private entity described
2115 by Subsection (a)(3).
2216 SECTION 2. Section 281.0565, Health and Safety Code, is
2317 amended by amending Subsections (c) and (d) and adding Subsections
2418 (e) and (f) to read as follows:
2519 (c) A charitable organization created by a district under
2620 this section is a unit of local government only for purposes of
2721 Chapter 101, Civil Practice and Remedies Code.
2822 (d) A district [created in a county with a population of
2923 more than 800,000 that was not included in the boundaries of a
3024 hospital district before September 1, 2003,] may make a capital or
3125 other financial contribution to a charitable organization created
3226 by the district to provide regional administration and delivery of
3327 health care services to or for the district.
3428 (e) A charitable organization created by a district under
3529 this section may contract, collaborate, or enter into a joint
3630 venture or other agreement with a public or private entity, without
3731 regard to that entity's for-profit or nonprofit status, and may
3832 hold an ownership interest in such an entity.
3933 (f) A charitable organization created by a district under
4034 this section remains subject to the laws of this state and the
4135 United States that govern charitable organizations. Nothing in
4236 this section may be construed as abrogating or modifying any other
4337 provision of law governing charitable organizations.
4438 SECTION 3. Subchapter C, Chapter 281, Health and Safety
4539 Code, is amended by adding Section 281.058 to read as follows:
4640 Sec. 281.058. AUTHORITY TO FORM CAPTIVE INSURANCE OR
4741 CAPTIVE MANAGEMENT COMPANY. (a) In this section, "captive
4842 insurance company" and "captive management company" have the
4943 meanings assigned to those terms by Section 964.001, Insurance
5044 Code.
5145 (b) A district, a combination of districts, or a nonprofit
5246 corporation formed by a district or a combination of districts to
5347 further the purposes of the district or districts, as appropriate,
5448 may form a captive insurance company or a captive management
5549 company in accordance with the provisions of Chapter 964, Insurance
5650 Code, for the purpose of engaging in the business of insurance under
5751 that chapter.
5852 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
5953 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
6054 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
6155 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
6256 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
63- * * * * *
57+ ______________________________ ______________________________
58+ President of the Senate Speaker of the House
59+ I certify that H.B. No. 2557 was passed by the House on April
60+ 27, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 140, Nays 0, 1 present, not
61+ voting.
62+ ______________________________
63+ Chief Clerk of the House
64+ I certify that H.B. No. 2557 was passed by the Senate on May
65+ 20, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
66+ ______________________________
67+ Secretary of the Senate
68+ APPROVED: _____________________
69+ Date
70+ _____________________
71+ Governor