Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2559 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Zerwas (Senate Sponsor - Watson) H.B. No. 2559
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 28, 2015;
 April 30, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 11, 2015, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 11, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 LucioX
 BettencourtX
 CampbellX
 GarciaX
 MenéndezX
 NicholsX
 TaylorofGalvestonX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to leases and other agreements relating to real property
 entered into by certain hospital districts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 281.050(b), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  Notwithstanding any other law, the board may, with the
 approval of the commissioners court, enter into a lease, including
 a lease with an option to purchase, an installment purchase
 agreement, an installment sale agreement, or any other type of
 agreement that relates to real property considered appropriate by
 the board [undeveloped real property for not more than 50 years] to
 provide for the development, improvement, acquisition, or
 management of developed or undeveloped real property [and
 construction of facilities] designed to generate revenue for the
 financial benefit of the district.  The board, directly or through a
 nonprofit corporation, may contract or enter into a joint venture
 with a public or private entity as necessary to enter into an
 agreement [a lease] under this subsection.
 SECTION 2.  Section 281.0511, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (d) to read as follows:
 (d)  Notwithstanding any other law, the board may, with the
 approval of the commissioners court at a meeting subject to Chapter
 551, Government Code, lease undeveloped or vacant real property for
 not more than 99 years to provide for the development and
 construction of facilities designed to generate revenue for the
 financial benefit of the district.  The board, directly or through
 a nonprofit corporation, may contract or enter into a joint venture
 with a public or private entity as necessary to enter into a lease
 under this subsection.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *