Senate | 05/12/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 1432 | |
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1432 | |
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1308 | |
House | 05/04/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2560 | |
House | 05/04/2015 | Record vote | RV#554 | Journal Page: 2379 |
House | 05/04/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 2379 | |
House | 05/04/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2379 | |
House | 05/02/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/01/2015 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2323 | |
House | 05/01/2015 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2323 | |
House | 05/01/2015 | Amended | 1-G. Bonnen | Journal Page: 2322 |
House | 05/01/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2322 | |
House | 05/01/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Record vote | RV#490 | Journal Page: 2245 |
House | 04/30/2015 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 2245 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/10/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/10/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/09/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 617 | |
House | 03/03/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/03/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/03/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 02/24/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 02/24/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 02/24/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 02/24/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 02/24/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/11/2015 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 276 | |
House | 02/11/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 276 | |
House | 11/12/2014 | Filed |