House
|
05/13/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3112
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Recommitted to committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2827
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2631
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2676
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2015
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 771
|
House
|
03/17/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 771
|
House
|
03/06/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|