Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2589 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Phelan, Fallon (Senate Sponsor - Nichols) H.B. No. 2589
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2015;
 May 6, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 21, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 21, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 WhitmireX
 HuffmanX
 BurtonX
 CreightonX
 HinojosaX
 MenéndezX
 PerryX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the prosecution of and punishment for assaulting a
 disabled individual; increasing a criminal penalty.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 22.021(b), Penal Code, is amended by
 amending Subdivision (2) and adding Subdivision (3) to read as
 follows:
 (2)  "Elderly individual" has [and "disabled
 individual" have] the meaning [meanings] assigned by Section
 22.04(c).
 (3)  "Disabled individual" means a person older than 13
 years of age who by reason of age or physical or mental disease,
 defect, or injury is substantially unable to protect the person's
 self from harm or to provide food, shelter, or medical care for the
 person's self.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 An offense committed before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect on the date the offense was committed,
 and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For
 purposes of this section, an offense was committed before the
 effective date of this Act if any element of the offense was
 committed before that date.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *