Senate | 05/19/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/19/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/19/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/19/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development | Journal Page: 1536 | |
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1536 | |
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1509 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3267 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2985 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Record vote | RV#854 | Journal Page: 2985 |
House | 05/11/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 2985 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2984 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Reason for vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2951 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2951 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2951 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Amended | 1-Keffer | Journal Page: 2951 |
House | 05/08/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2951 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1707 | |
House | 04/14/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/17/2015 | Referred to Urban Affairs | Journal Page: 776 | |
House | 03/17/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 776 | |
House | 03/09/2015 | Filed |