Senate | 05/07/2015 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 1433 | |
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1433 | |
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1347 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2676 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2483 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2480 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Record vote | RV#592 | Journal Page: 2483 |
House | 05/05/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 2483 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2483 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2465 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2465 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/01/2015 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2111 | |
House | 04/27/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/16/2015 | Referred to Corrections | Journal Page: 731 | |
House | 03/16/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 731 | |
House | 03/09/2015 | Filed |