Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2598 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Kuempel, Ashby, Wray H.B. No. 2598
 (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 13, 2015;
 May 14, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural
 Resources and Economic Development; May 20, 2015, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 11, Nays 0; May 20, 2015,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the consideration of steel slag as solid waste by the
 Texas Commission on Environmental Quality.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 361, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 361.040 to read as follows:
 Sec. 361.040.  TREATMENT OF STEEL SLAG AS SOLID WASTE. The
 commission may not consider steel slag as solid waste if the steel
 slag is:
 (1)  an intended output or result of the use of an
 electric arc furnace to make steel;
 (2)  introduced into the stream of commerce; and
 (3)  managed as an item of commercial value, including
 through a controlled use in a manner constituting disposal, and not
 as discarded material.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *