Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2626 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/11/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Rose H.B. No. 2626


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of an advisory committee to examine and
 recommend a plan to increase the minimum age of juvenile
 jurisdiction.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  DEFINITION. In this Act, "board" means the Texas
 Juvenile Justice Board.
 SECTION 2.  JUVENILE JURISDICTION ADVISORY COMMITTEE. Not
 later than December 1, 2015, the board shall appoint an advisory
 committee to develop a plan for raising the minimum age of a child
 subject to juvenile court jurisdiction from 10 years of age to 13
 years of age.
 SECTION 3.  APPOINTMENTS; PRESIDING OFFICER. (a) In making
 appointments to the advisory committee, the board shall appoint
 members the board considers appropriate and who represent the
 geographic diversity of the state. The advisory committee must
 include:
 (1)  one member from the Texas Juvenile Justice
 Department;
 (2)  one member from the Department of State Health
 Services;
 (3)  one member from the Health and Human Services
 Commission;
 (4)  one member from the Texas Education Agency or who
 has expertise in education;
 (5)  one member from the Legislative Budget Board with
 relevant expertise;
 (6)  at least one member from the Department of Family
 and Protective Services;
 (7)  at least three chief juvenile probation officers,
 including at least one chief juvenile probation officer from an
 urban county, one chief juvenile probation officer from a suburban
 county, and one chief juvenile probation officer from a rural
 county;
 (8)  at least two members from local mental health
 authorities, including at least one member from an urban county and
 one member from a rural county;
 (9)  a prosecutor with expertise in prosecuting
 juvenile offenders;
 (10)  a defense attorney who specializes in juvenile
 defense;
 (11)  a youth advocate;
 (12)  private providers of youth services, including
 prevention services;
 (13)  an individual with expertise in adolescent
 development or the impact of trauma on adolescents;
 (14)  an individual who was involved with the juvenile
 justice system before the individual's thirteenth birthday or a
 parent of an individual who was involved with the juvenile justice
 system before the individual's thirteenth birthday; and
 (15)  any other member considered appropriate by the
 board.
 (b)  The board shall select one member of the advisory
 committee to serve as presiding officer of the advisory committee.
 SECTION 4.  COMPENSATION. A member of the advisory
 committee serves without compensation and is not entitled to
 reimbursement for travel expenses.
 SECTION 5.  APPLICATION OF LAWS GOVERNING ADVISORY
 COMMITTEES. The advisory committee is not subject to Chapter 2110,
 Government Code.
 SECTION 6.  DUTIES OF ADVISORY COMMITTEE. The advisory
 committee shall:
 (1)  evaluate the feasibility of raising the minimum
 age of a child subject to juvenile court jurisdiction from 10 years
 of age to 13 years of age;
 (2)  identify services currently available for
 juveniles between 10 and 13 years of age within the juvenile justice
 system; and
 (3)  develop an implementation plan to raise the
 minimum age of a child subject to juvenile court jurisdiction from
 10 years of age to 13 years of age, including:
 (A)  methods for ensuring that juveniles between
 10 and 13 years of age who currently receive services through the
 juvenile justice system continue to be eligible for and receive
 services outside of the juvenile justice system; and
 (B)  any legislative, administrative, or funding
 provisions required to adopt the plan.
 SECTION 7.  REPORT. Not later than December 1, 2016, the
 advisory committee shall submit to the Texas Juvenile Justice
 Board, the governor, the lieutenant governor, and appropriate
 committees of the legislature a report that contains the advisory
 committee's findings and the implementation plan developed under
 Section 6 of this Act.
 SECTION 8.  EXPIRATION DATE. The advisory committee is
 abolished and this Act expires December 31, 2016.
 SECTION 9.  EFFECTIVE DATE.  This Act takes effect
 immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members
 elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas
 Constitution.  If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for
 immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2015.