LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
House
Bills
HB2633
Compare Versions
TX
Texas House Bill HB2633
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas House Bill HB2633
Compare Versions
HB2633 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB2633 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB2633 Enrolled June 1, 2015
HB2633 Comm Sub May 22, 2015
HB2633 Engrossed May 6, 2015
HB2633 Comm Sub April 26, 2015
HB2633 Introduced March 9, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
HB2633 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB2633 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB2633 Enrolled June 1, 2015
HB2633 Comm Sub May 22, 2015
HB2633 Engrossed May 6, 2015
HB2633 Comm Sub April 26, 2015
HB2633 Introduced March 9, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare