Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2634 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Kuempel, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 2634
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2015;
 May 15, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Business
 and Commerce; May 22, 2015, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 2; May 22, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the construction manager-at-risk used by a governmental
 entity.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 2269.252, Government Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsection (c) to read as
 follows:
 (b)  The governmental entity's architect or engineer for a
 project, or an entity related to the governmental entity's
 architect or engineer, may not serve, alone or in combination with
 another person, as the construction manager-at-risk [unless the
 architect or engineer is hired to serve as the construction
 manager-at-risk under a separate or concurrent selection process
 conducted in accordance with this subchapter].  This subsection
 does not prohibit the governmental entity's architect or engineer
 from providing customary construction phase services under the
 architect's or engineer's original professional service agreement
 in accordance with applicable licensing laws.
 (c)  For purposes of Subsection (b), an entity is related to
 the governmental entity's architect or engineer if the entity is a
 sole proprietorship, corporation, partnership, limited liability
 company, or other entity that is a subsidiary, parent corporation,
 or partner or has any other relationship in which the governmental
 entity's architect or engineer has an ownership interest, or is
 subject to common ownership or control, or is party to an agreement
 by which it will receive any proceeds of the construction
 manager-at-risk's payments from the governmental entity.
 SECTION 2.  This Act applies only to a contract for the
 services of a construction manager-at-risk entered into on or after
 the effective date of this Act. A contract entered into for the
 services of a construction manager-at-risk before the effective
 date of this Act is governed by the law in effect when the contract
 was entered into, and the former law is continued in effect for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *