Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2647 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-By: Ashby, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Estes) H.B. No. 2647
2- (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2015;
3- May 12, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural
4- Resources and Economic Development; May 20, 2015, reported
5- favorably by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 2; May 20, 2015, sent
6- to printer.)
1+H.B. No. 2647
72
83
9- COMMITTEE VOTE
10- YeaNayAbsentPNV
11- FraserX
12- EstesX
13- BirdwellX
14- HallX
15- HancockX
16- HinojosaX
17- LucioX
18- NicholsX
19- SeligerX
20- UrestiX
21- ZaffiriniX
22- A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
234 AN ACT
245 relating to a limitation on the authority to curtail groundwater
256 production from wells used for power generation or mining.
267 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
278 SECTION 1. Subchapter D, Chapter 36, Water Code, is amended
289 by adding Section 36.1175 to read as follows:
2910 Sec. 36.1175. POWER GENERATION EXEMPTION. (a) This
3011 section applies to a well that produces groundwater used to support
3112 the operation of a power generation facility or a mine that provides
3213 fuel to a power generation facility, including production for
3314 boiler makeup water, fire suppression, dewatering, potable water,
3415 and depressurization.
3516 (b) An owner or operator of a well to which this section
3617 applies is entitled to petition the district for a delay in the
3718 effective date of any district action that would reduce or curtail
3819 production from a well or limit the groundwater production rate of a
3920 well to an amount that is less than:
4021 (1) the maximum annual amount of withdrawal as of
4122 September 1, 2014, authorized by the permit, regardless of whether
4223 the permit was issued by the district or the Railroad Commission of
4324 Texas; or
4425 (2) the maximum annual historical amount of withdrawal
4526 recorded before September 1, 2014, if the well was in operation on
4627 that date and no permit from any entity was required for the
4728 operation of the well.
4829 (c) The owner or operator of a well subject to this section
4930 may petition for a delay described by Subsection (b). The petition
5031 must include evidence that the owner or operator is engaging in good
5132 faith efforts to identify practicable, readily available
5233 alternative sources of water with comparable quality. After
5334 receipt of the petition, the district shall hold a public hearing
5435 and after the hearing shall make a final determination as to whether
5536 the proposed reduction or curtailment in groundwater production
5637 would threaten public health or safety or the reliability of the
5738 electric grid. The proposed reduction or curtailment for which the
5839 owner or operator is seeking a delay may not take effect until the
5940 district has made a final determination under this subsection.
6041 (d) If the district determines under Subsection (c) that a
6142 proposed reduction or curtailment in groundwater production would
6243 threaten public health or safety or the reliability of the electric
6344 grid, the district shall delay the effective date of the reduction
6445 or curtailment to a date not earlier than seven years after the date
6546 that the final determination is made.
6647 (e) If an owner or operator receives a delay under
6748 Subsection (d), the owner or operator may petition the district at
6849 any time before the delayed effective date of the proposed
6950 reduction or curtailment to delay the effective date a second time
7051 for an additional three years as provided by this subsection. After
7152 receiving the petition, the district shall hold a public hearing
7253 and after the hearing shall make a final determination to approve
7354 the additional three-year delay if the district determines that:
7455 (1) the owner or operator has engaged in good faith
7556 efforts to identify and begin implementing strategies to comply
7657 with the proposed reduction or curtailment; and
7758 (2) implementation of the proposed reduction or
7859 curtailment in groundwater production on the date set under
7960 Subsection (d) would threaten public health or safety or the
8061 reliability of the electric grid.
8162 (f) In making a final determination described by Subsection
8263 (c), (d), or (e), the district shall request, obtain, and give great
8364 weight to an opinion issued by the Public Utility Commission of
8465 Texas.
8566 SECTION 2. The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
8667 a reduction or curtailment in groundwater production ordered by a
8768 groundwater conservation district on or after the effective date of
8869 this Act. A reduction or curtailment in groundwater production
8970 ordered by a groundwater conservation district before the effective
9071 date of this Act is governed by the law in effect at the time the
9172 reduction or curtailment in groundwater production was ordered, and
9273 the former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
9374 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
9475 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
9576 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
9677 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
9778 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
98- * * * * *
79+ ______________________________ ______________________________
80+ President of the Senate Speaker of the House
81+ I certify that H.B. No. 2647 was passed by the House on May 4,
82+ 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 139, Nays 2, 1 present, not
83+ voting.
84+ ______________________________
85+ Chief Clerk of the House
86+ I certify that H.B. No. 2647 was passed by the Senate on May
87+ 26, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 21, Nays 10.
88+ ______________________________
89+ Secretary of the Senate
90+ APPROVED: _____________________
91+ Date
92+ _____________________
93+ Governor