Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2660 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Howard, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Watson) H.B. No. 2660
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2015;
 May 13, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 21, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 21, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 TaylorofGalvestonX
 LucioX
 BettencourtX
 CampbellX
 GarciaX
 HuffinesX
 KolkhorstX
 RodríguezX
 SeligerX
 TaylorofCollinX
 WestX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to Foundation School Program funding for students enrolled
 in an optional flexible school day program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 29.0822, Education Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (d) and adding Subsection (d-1) to read as
 follows:
 (d)  The commissioner may adopt rules for the administration
 of this section, including rules establishing application
 requirements.  Subject to Subsection (d-1), the [The] commissioner
 shall calculate average daily attendance for students served under
 this section.  The commissioner shall allow accumulations of hours
 of instruction for students whose schedule would not otherwise
 allow full state funding.  Funding under this subsection shall be
 determined based on the number of instructional days in the school
 district calendar and a seven-hour school day, but attendance may
 be cumulated over a school year, including any summer or vacation
 session.  The attendance of students who accumulate less than the
 number of attendance hours required under this subsection shall be
 proportionately reduced for funding purposes.  The commissioner
 may:
 (1)  set maximum funding amounts for an individual
 course under this section; and
 (2)  limit funding for the attendance of a student
 described by Subsection (a)(3) in a course under this section to
 funding only for the attendance necessary for the student to earn
 class credit that, as a result of attendance requirements under
 Section 25.092, the student would not otherwise be able to receive
 without retaking the class.
 (d-1)  In calculating average daily attendance for students
 served under this section, the commissioner shall ensure that
 funding for attendance in a course in a program under this section
 is based on the same instructional hour requirements of the regular
 program rather than a full-time equivalent student basis that
 requires six hours of student contact time to qualify for a full day
 of attendance.
 SECTION 2.  Section 42.005(a), Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (a)  In this chapter, average daily attendance is:
 (1)  the quotient of the sum of attendance for each day
 of the minimum number of days of instruction as described under
 Section 25.081(a) divided by the minimum number of days of
 instruction;
 (2)  for a district that operates under a flexible year
 program under Section 29.0821, the quotient of the sum of
 attendance for each actual day of instruction as permitted by
 Section 29.0821(b)(1) divided by the number of actual days of
 instruction as permitted by Section 29.0821(b)(1); or
 (3)  for a district that operates under a flexible
 school day program under Section 29.0822, the average daily
 attendance as calculated by the commissioner in accordance with
 Sections [Section] 29.0822(d) and (d-1).
 SECTION 3.  This Act applies beginning with the 2015-2016
 school year.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *