LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
House
Bills
HB2665
Compare Versions
TX
Texas House Bill HB2665
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas House Bill HB2665
Compare Versions
HB2665 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB2665 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB2665 Enrolled May 28, 2015
HB2665 Comm Sub May 21, 2015
HB2665 Engrossed May 11, 2015
HB2665 Comm Sub April 29, 2015
HB2665 Introduced March 9, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
HB2665 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB2665 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB2665 Enrolled May 28, 2015
HB2665 Comm Sub May 21, 2015
HB2665 Engrossed May 11, 2015
HB2665 Comm Sub April 29, 2015
HB2665 Introduced March 9, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare