House | 05/14/2015 | Postponed | 5/21/15 8:00 AM | Journal Page: 3421 |
House | 05/14/2015 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3421 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Postponed | 5/14/15 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 2724 |
House | 05/07/2015 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2723 | |
House | 05/01/2015 | Postponed | 5/7/15 9:00 AM | Journal Page: 2310 |
House | 05/01/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2310 | |
House | 05/01/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1944 | |
House | 04/16/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/02/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/02/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/16/2015 | Referred to Economic & Small Business Development | Journal Page: 715 | |
House | 03/16/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 715 | |
House | 03/12/2015 | Filed |