Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2710 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Thompson of Harris (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 2710
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 13, 2015;
 May 14, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 22, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 22, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the duty of an attorney ad litem to locate and represent
 a defendant in a suit to collect a delinquent ad valorem tax.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 33, Tax Code, is amended by
 adding Section 33.475 to read as follows:
 Sec. 33.475.  ATTORNEY AD LITEM REPORT; APPROVAL OF FEES.
 (a) In a suit to collect a delinquent tax, an attorney ad litem
 appointed by a court to represent the interests of a defendant
 served with process by means of citation by publication or posting
 shall submit to the court a report describing the actions taken by
 the attorney ad litem to locate and represent the interests of the
 defendant.
 (b)  The court may not approve the fees of the attorney ad
 litem until the attorney ad litem submits the report required by
 this section and the court determines that the actions taken by the
 attorney ad litem as described in the report were sufficient to
 discharge the attorney's duties to the defendant.
 SECTION 2.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 an attorney ad litem appointed to represent the interests of a
 defendant in a delinquent tax suit on or after the effective date of
 this Act.  An attorney ad litem appointed to represent the interests
 of a defendant in a delinquent tax suit before the effective date of
 this Act is governed by the law in effect on the date the attorney
 was appointed, and the former law is continued in effect for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *