House | 05/12/2015 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 3125 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 1931 | Journal Page: 3125 |
House | 05/12/2015 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/11/2015 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/11/2015 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 3014 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2966 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/16/2015 | Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues | Journal Page: 740 | |
House | 03/16/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 740 | |
House | 03/09/2015 | Filed |