E | 06/10/2015 | Effective on 9/1/15 | ||
E | 06/10/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6048 | |
E | 05/22/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 4344 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1897 | |
House | 05/22/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4214 | |
House | 05/21/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4218 | |
House | 05/20/2015 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 3908 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1747 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1747 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1747 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1747 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 1747 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1747 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1746 | |
Senate | 05/19/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/15/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/15/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1625 | |
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development | Journal Page: 1389 | |
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1389 | |
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1311 | |
House | 05/04/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2560 | |
House | 05/04/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2388 | |
House | 05/04/2015 | Record vote | RV#564 | Journal Page: 2387 |
House | 05/04/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 2387 | |
House | 05/04/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2387 | |
House | 05/02/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/01/2015 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2325 | |
House | 05/01/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2325 | |
House | 05/01/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Record vote | RV#490 | Journal Page: 2245 |
House | 04/30/2015 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 2245 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/17/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1745 | |
House | 04/16/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/16/2015 | Referred to Economic & Small Business Development | Journal Page: 741 | |
House | 03/16/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 741 | |
House | 03/09/2015 | Filed |