E
|
05/23/2015
|
Effective on 1/1/16
|
|
|
E
|
05/23/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4468
|
E
|
05/14/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3676
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1593
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3545
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3548
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3263
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1526
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1526
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1526
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1526
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1526
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1526
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1526
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1392
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 1122
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1122
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1060
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1945
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#326
|
Journal Page: 1799
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1799
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1799
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1774
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1774
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Transferred to Calendars Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1389
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2015
|
Referred to Agriculture & Livestock
|
|
Journal Page: 294
|
House
|
02/12/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 294
|
House
|
11/12/2014
|
Filed
|
|
|