Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2771 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Martinez, Springer, Guillen H.B. No. 2771
 (Senate Sponsor - Taylor of Galveston)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2015;
 May 4, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Business
 and Commerce; May 15, 2015, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 15, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 EltifeX
 CreightonX
 EllisX
 HuffinesX
 SchwertnerX
 SeligerX
 TaylorofGalvestonX
 WatsonX
 WhitmireX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to employment activities of certain emergency response
 personnel for purposes of the Texas Workers' Compensation Act.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 401, Labor Code, is
 amended by adding Section 401.026 to read as follows:
 Sec. 401.026.  APPLICABILITY TO CERTAIN EMERGENCY RESPONSE
 PERSONNEL. For purposes of this subtitle, the travel of a
 firefighter or emergency medical personnel en route to an emergency
 call is considered to be in the course and scope of the
 firefighter's or emergency medical personnel's employment.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *