Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2778 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Elkins (Senate Sponsor - Bettencourt) H.B. No. 2778
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 11, 2015;
 May 12, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 19, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 19, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the elections for which federal postcard applicant
 voters may be sent ballots by e-mail.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 101.104, Election Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 101.104.  ELECTIONS COVERED. Balloting  [The e-mail
 transmission of balloting] materials may be sent by e-mail under
 this subchapter for any election in which the voter who registers
 under this chapter is eligible to vote [is limited to:
 [(1)     an election in which an office of the federal
 government appears on the ballot, including a primary election;
 [(2)     an election to fill a vacancy in the legislature
 unless:
 [(A)     the election is ordered as an emergency
 election under Section 41.0011; or
 [(B)     the election is held as an expedited
 election under Section 203.013; or
 [(3)     an election held jointly with an election
 described by Subdivision (1) or (2)].
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *