LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
House
Bills
HB2789
Compare Versions
TX
Texas House Bill HB2789
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas House Bill HB2789
Compare Versions
HB2789 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB2789 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB2789 Enrolled May 27, 2015
HB2789 Comm Sub May 21, 2015
HB2789 Engrossed April 23, 2015
HB2789 Introduced March 10, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
HB2789 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB2789 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB2789 Enrolled May 27, 2015
HB2789 Comm Sub May 21, 2015
HB2789 Engrossed April 23, 2015
HB2789 Introduced March 10, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare