Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB28 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/12/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    84R3561 CLG-D
 By: Button H.B. No. 28


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to an audit by the state auditor of certain programs and
 funds providing economic development incentives to entities and
 other persons.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 321, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Section 321.0139 to read as follows:
 Sec. 321.0139.  AUDIT OF CERTAIN ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT
 PROGRAMS AND FUNDS. (a) Beginning September 1, 2015, and once
 every 12 years after that date, the state auditor shall conduct an
 audit of the following:
 (1)  the rural economic development and investment
 program established under Section 12.0271, Agriculture Code; and
 (2)  the young farmer grant program under Subchapter G,
 Chapter 58, Agriculture Code.
 (b)  Beginning September 1, 2017, and once every 12 years
 after that date, the state auditor shall conduct an audit of the
 following:
 (1)  the agricultural biomass and landfill diversion
 incentive program established under Chapter 22, Agriculture Code;
 (2)  the defense economic adjustment assistance grant
 program;
 (3)  the agricultural loan guarantee program
 established under Subchapter E, Chapter 58, Agriculture Code;
 (4)  the young farmer interest rate reduction program
 established under Subchapter F, Chapter 58, Agriculture Code; and
 (5)  the interest rate reduction program established
 under Section 44.007, Agriculture Code.
 (c)  Beginning September 1, 2019, and once every 12 years
 after that date, the state auditor shall conduct an audit of:
 (1)  the rural investment fund program under Section
 12.046, Agriculture Code;
 (2)  the capital access program established under
 Subchapter BB, Chapter 481;
 (3)  the linked deposit program established under
 Section 481.193;
 (4)  the moving image industry incentive program under
 Subchapter B, Chapter 485;
 (5)  the product development program under Subchapter
 D, Chapter 489;
 (6)  the small business incubator program under
 Subchapter D, Chapter 489; and
 (7)  the certified capital company program established
 under Chapter 228, Insurance Code.
 (d)  Beginning September 1, 2021, and once every 12 years
 after that date, the state auditor shall conduct an audit of:
 (1)  the program to provide grants of money from the
 Texas Enterprise Fund under Section 481.078;
 (2)  the program to provide disbursements from events
 trust funds established under Section 5C, Chapter 1507 (S.B. 456),
 Acts of the 76th Legislature, Regular Session, 1999 (Article
 5190.14, Vernon's Texas Civil Statutes), for event support
 contracts; and
 (3)  the program to provide disbursements from major
 events trust funds established under Section 5A, Chapter 1507 (S.B.
 456), Acts of the 76th Legislature, Regular Session, 1999 (Article
 5190.14, Vernon's Texas Civil Statutes), for game support contracts
 or event support contracts.
 (e)  Beginning September 1, 2023, and once every 12 years
 after that date, the state auditor shall conduct an audit of:
 (1)  the program to provide disbursements from motor
 sports racing trust funds established under Section 5B, Chapter
 1507 (S.B. 456), Acts of the 76th Legislature, Regular Session,
 1999 (Article 5190.14, Vernon's Texas Civil Statutes), for motor
 sports racing events support contracts or event support contracts;
 (2)  the program to provide disbursements from special
 event trust funds established under Section 398.007, Local
 Government Code;
 (3)  the program to provide allocations of money for
 emerging technology from the Texas emerging technology fund
 established under Chapter 490; and
 (4)  the skills development fund program established
 under Chapter 303, Labor Code.
 (f)  The state auditor may establish the scope of an audit
 and objective for an audit conducted under this section that are
 consistent with generally accepted government auditing standards
 and with other audits conducted by the state auditor under this
 chapter.
 (g)  To the extent practicable, the state auditor may assess
 the efficiency and effectiveness of the program or fund subject to
 an audit under this section.
 (h)  The state auditor shall prepare a report of each audit
 conducted under this section. Not later than the second anniversary
 of the date on which an audit required to be conducted under this
 section is scheduled to begin, the state auditor shall file the
 report with the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of
 representatives, and the presiding officer of each standing
 committee of the senate and house of representatives with primary
 jurisdiction over economic development.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.