1 | 1 | | 84R22516 CLG-D |
---|
2 | 2 | | By: Button, Nevárez H.B. No. 28 |
---|
3 | 3 | | Substitute the following for H.B. No. 28: |
---|
4 | 4 | | By: Johnson C.S.H.B. No. 28 |
---|
5 | 5 | | |
---|
6 | 6 | | |
---|
7 | 7 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
8 | 8 | | AN ACT |
---|
9 | 9 | | relating to an audit by the state auditor of certain programs and |
---|
10 | 10 | | funds providing economic development incentives to entities and |
---|
11 | 11 | | other persons. |
---|
12 | 12 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
13 | 13 | | SECTION 1. Chapter 321, Government Code, is amended by |
---|
14 | 14 | | adding Section 321.0139 to read as follows: |
---|
15 | 15 | | Sec. 321.0139. AUDIT OF CERTAIN ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT |
---|
16 | 16 | | PROGRAMS AND FUNDS. (a) Beginning September 1, 2015, once every 12 |
---|
17 | 17 | | years the state auditor shall conduct an audit of each of the |
---|
18 | 18 | | following: |
---|
19 | 19 | | (1) the rural economic development and investment |
---|
20 | 20 | | program established under Section 12.0271, Agriculture Code; and |
---|
21 | 21 | | (2) the young farmer grant program under Subchapter G, |
---|
22 | 22 | | Chapter 58, Agriculture Code. |
---|
23 | 23 | | (b) Beginning September 1, 2017, once every 12 years the |
---|
24 | 24 | | state auditor shall conduct an audit of each of the following: |
---|
25 | 25 | | (1) the agricultural biomass and landfill diversion |
---|
26 | 26 | | incentive program established under Chapter 22, Agriculture Code; |
---|
27 | 27 | | (2) the defense economic adjustment assistance grant |
---|
28 | 28 | | program; |
---|
29 | 29 | | (3) the agricultural loan guarantee program |
---|
30 | 30 | | established under Subchapter E, Chapter 58, Agriculture Code; |
---|
31 | 31 | | (4) the young farmer interest rate reduction program |
---|
32 | 32 | | established under Subchapter F, Chapter 58, Agriculture Code; and |
---|
33 | 33 | | (5) the interest rate reduction program established |
---|
34 | 34 | | under Section 44.007, Agriculture Code. |
---|
35 | 35 | | (c) Beginning September 1, 2019, once every 12 years the |
---|
36 | 36 | | state auditor shall conduct an audit of each of the following: |
---|
37 | 37 | | (1) the rural investment fund program under Section |
---|
38 | 38 | | 12.046, Agriculture Code; |
---|
39 | 39 | | (2) the capital access program established under |
---|
40 | 40 | | Subchapter BB, Chapter 481; |
---|
41 | 41 | | (3) the linked deposit program established under |
---|
42 | 42 | | Section 481.193; |
---|
43 | 43 | | (4) the moving image industry incentive program under |
---|
44 | 44 | | Subchapter B, Chapter 485; |
---|
45 | 45 | | (5) the product development program under Subchapter |
---|
46 | 46 | | D, Chapter 489; |
---|
47 | 47 | | (6) the small business incubator program under |
---|
48 | 48 | | Subchapter D, Chapter 489; and |
---|
49 | 49 | | (7) the certified capital company program established |
---|
50 | 50 | | under Chapter 228, Insurance Code. |
---|
51 | 51 | | (d) Beginning September 1, 2021, once every 12 years the |
---|
52 | 52 | | state auditor shall conduct an audit of each of the following: |
---|
53 | 53 | | (1) the program to provide grants of money from the |
---|
54 | 54 | | Texas Enterprise Fund under Section 481.078; |
---|
55 | 55 | | (2) the program to provide disbursements from events |
---|
56 | 56 | | trust funds established under Section 5C, Chapter 1507 (S.B. 456), |
---|
57 | 57 | | Acts of the 76th Legislature, Regular Session, 1999 (Article |
---|
58 | 58 | | 5190.14, Vernon's Texas Civil Statutes), for event support |
---|
59 | 59 | | contracts; and |
---|
60 | 60 | | (3) the program to provide disbursements from major |
---|
61 | 61 | | events trust funds established under Section 5A, Chapter 1507 (S.B. |
---|
62 | 62 | | 456), Acts of the 76th Legislature, Regular Session, 1999 (Article |
---|
63 | 63 | | 5190.14, Vernon's Texas Civil Statutes), for game support contracts |
---|
64 | 64 | | or event support contracts. |
---|
65 | 65 | | (e) Beginning September 1, 2023, once every 12 years the |
---|
66 | 66 | | state auditor shall conduct an audit of each of the following: |
---|
67 | 67 | | (1) the program to provide disbursements from motor |
---|
68 | 68 | | sports racing trust funds established under Section 5B, Chapter |
---|
69 | 69 | | 1507 (S.B. 456), Acts of the 76th Legislature, Regular Session, |
---|
70 | 70 | | 1999 (Article 5190.14, Vernon's Texas Civil Statutes), for motor |
---|
71 | 71 | | sports racing events support contracts or event support contracts; |
---|
72 | 72 | | (2) the program to provide disbursements from special |
---|
73 | 73 | | event trust funds established under Section 398.007, Local |
---|
74 | 74 | | Government Code; |
---|
75 | 75 | | (3) the program to provide allocations of money for |
---|
76 | 76 | | emerging technology from the Texas emerging technology fund |
---|
77 | 77 | | established under Chapter 490; and |
---|
78 | 78 | | (4) the skills development fund program established |
---|
79 | 79 | | under Chapter 303, Labor Code. |
---|
80 | 80 | | (f) The state auditor may establish the scope of an audit |
---|
81 | 81 | | and objective for an audit conducted under this section that are |
---|
82 | 82 | | consistent with generally accepted government auditing standards |
---|
83 | 83 | | and with other audits conducted by the state auditor under this |
---|
84 | 84 | | chapter. |
---|
85 | 85 | | (g) To the extent practicable, the state auditor may assess |
---|
86 | 86 | | the efficiency and effectiveness of the program or fund subject to |
---|
87 | 87 | | an audit under this section. |
---|
88 | 88 | | (h) The state auditor shall prepare a report of each audit |
---|
89 | 89 | | conducted under this section. Not later than the second anniversary |
---|
90 | 90 | | of the date on which an audit required to be conducted under this |
---|
91 | 91 | | section is scheduled to begin, the state auditor shall file the |
---|
92 | 92 | | report with the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of |
---|
93 | 93 | | representatives, and the presiding officer of each standing |
---|
94 | 94 | | committee of the senate and house of representatives with primary |
---|
95 | 95 | | jurisdiction over economic development. |
---|
96 | 96 | | (i) The scheduling of the audits specified by this section |
---|
97 | 97 | | is subject to a risk assessment in accordance with Chapter 321 and |
---|
98 | 98 | | to inclusion in the annual audit plan under Section 321.013(c). If |
---|
99 | 99 | | the state auditor determines that an exception to the schedule |
---|
100 | 100 | | specified by this section is warranted, the state auditor shall |
---|
101 | 101 | | notify the Legislative Audit Committee and each standing committee |
---|
102 | 102 | | of the senate and house of representatives with primary |
---|
103 | 103 | | jurisdiction over economic development of the reasons for the |
---|
104 | 104 | | exception. |
---|
105 | 105 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2015. |
---|