E
|
06/19/2015
|
See remarks for effective date
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6049
|
E
|
06/01/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6047
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3626
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6045
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6047
|
Senate
|
05/31/2015
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3618
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5886
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1807
|
Journal Page: 5886
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5869
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6021
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 3510
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3510
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3510
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3425
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5568
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5568
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3139
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 3139
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2853
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2853
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2853
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4994
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4994
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 4994
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4759
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2150
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2150
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2150
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2150
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2150
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2150
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2150
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1946
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 1673
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1673
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1630
|
House
|
05/17/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3788
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3628
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1155
|
Journal Page: 3627
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3627
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
2-Dutton
|
Journal Page: 3626
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Amended
|
1-Aycock
|
Journal Page: 3625
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3625
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3533
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1107
|
Journal Page: 3532
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3532
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Amended
|
9-Giddings
|
Journal Page: 3531
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
8-S. Turner
|
Journal Page: 3530
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Point of order withdrawn (amendment)
|
Rule 11, Section 3
|
Journal Page: 3526
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
4-Phillips
|
Journal Page: 3525
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3521
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2966
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2015
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 746
|
House
|
03/16/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 746
|
House
|
03/10/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|