LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
House
Bills
HB281
Compare Versions
TX
Texas House Bill HB281
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas House Bill HB281
Compare Versions
HB281 Senate Committee Report February 1, 2025
HB281 House Committee Report February 1, 2025
HB281 Enrolled May 30, 2015
HB281 Comm Sub May 21, 2015
HB281 Engrossed May 11, 2015
HB281 Comm Sub April 22, 2015
HB281 Introduced November 12, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
HB281 Senate Committee Report February 1, 2025
HB281 House Committee Report February 1, 2025
HB281 Enrolled May 30, 2015
HB281 Comm Sub May 21, 2015
HB281 Engrossed May 11, 2015
HB281 Comm Sub April 22, 2015
HB281 Introduced November 12, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare