Senate | 05/25/2015 | Co-sponsor authorized | Journal Page: 2161 | |
Senate | 05/23/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1945 | |
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1782 | |
Senate | 05/13/2015 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 1576 | |
Senate | 05/13/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1576 | |
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1509 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3267 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2981 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Record vote | RV#850 | Journal Page: 2981 |
House | 05/11/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 2981 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2980 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2948 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Amended | 1-K. King | Journal Page: 2948 |
House | 05/08/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2948 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2343 | |
House | 04/27/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/16/2015 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 746 | |
House | 03/16/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 746 | |
House | 03/10/2015 | Filed |