E
|
05/28/2015
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
05/28/2015
|
Filed without the Governor's signature
|
|
Journal Page: 5572
|
E
|
05/20/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4088
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1715
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3785
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3846
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3573
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1621
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1621
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1621
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1621
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1621
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1621
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1621
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1612
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1583
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1582
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Referred to Administration
|
|
Journal Page: 1576
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1576
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1554
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3405
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#969
|
Journal Page: 3183
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3183
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3182
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3015
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3015
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Called from the table
|
|
Journal Page: 3015
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
1 legislative day notice-to call from table
|
|
Journal Page: 2953
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Laid on the table subject to call
|
|
Journal Page: 2128
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Companion considered in lieu of
|
SB 1137
|
Journal Page: 2128
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Recommendations filed with the Speaker
|
|
Journal Page: 1472
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1390
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Recalled from subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in s/c
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2015
|
Referred directly to s/c on Bond Indebtedness by chair
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2015
|
Referred to Investments & Financial Services
|
|
Journal Page: 853
|
House
|
03/18/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 853
|
House
|
03/12/2015
|
Transmitted to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|