House | 05/04/2015 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 2409 | |
House | 05/04/2015 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 1353 | Journal Page: 2409 |
House | 04/27/2015 | Postponed | 5/4/2015 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 1997 |
House | 04/27/2015 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 1997 | |
House | 04/22/2015 | Postponed | 4/27/15 2:00 PM | Journal Page: 1817 |
House | 04/22/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1817 | |
House | 04/22/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1706 | |
House | 04/09/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/02/2015 | Meeting cancelled | ||
House | 04/02/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/17/2015 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 776 | |
House | 03/17/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 776 | |
House | 03/10/2015 | Filed |