House | 05/12/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/04/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2015 | Transferred to Calendars Committee | ||
House | 05/01/2015 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/01/2015 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 03/31/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/30/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1340 | |
House | 03/26/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/26/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 03/26/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/11/2015 | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety | Journal Page: 278 | |
House | 02/11/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 278 | |
House | 11/13/2014 | Filed |