Senate | 05/21/2015 | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development | Journal Page: 1818 | |
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1818 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1465 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2966 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2686 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Record vote | RV#690 | Journal Page: 2686 |
House | 05/07/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 2686 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2686 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2608 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2608 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Amended | 1-Workman | Journal Page: 2608 |
House | 05/06/2015 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2608 | |
House | 05/01/2015 | Postponed | 5/6/15 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 2312 |
House | 05/01/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2312 | |
House | 05/01/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2064 | |
House | 04/21/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/16/2015 | Referred to Urban Affairs | Journal Page: 750 | |
House | 03/16/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 750 | |
House | 03/10/2015 | Filed |