Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 1390
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1390
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1348
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2676
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2483
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2480
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#592
|
Journal Page: 2483
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2483
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2483
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2466
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2466
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1784
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2015
|
Referred to Land & Resource Management
|
|
Journal Page: 777
|
House
|
03/17/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 777
|
House
|
03/10/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|